Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Discharged from the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|