Louisiana 2024 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB959

Introduced
4/2/24  
Introduced
4/2/24  
Refer
4/3/24  
Refer
4/3/24  

Caption

Provides relative to the sunset of licenses

Impact

The proposed legislation has sparked discussions regarding its potential impacts on professional standards and public safety. Supporters argue that removing certain licensure requirements will help streamline processes, encouraging economic growth and allowing professionals to practice without the hurdles of extensive regulatory obligations. However, the sunset of these licenses also raises concerns that it could lead to a decline in professional accountability and consumer protection in industries that rely on specified qualifications.

Summary

House Bill 959 aims to terminate the licensure requirements for various professions and occupations across Louisiana. This bill specifies that all licenses authorized by certain departments, boards, and commissions will expire on predetermined dates, with several slated for termination by July 1, 2026. Notably, this includes licenses from entities such as the Louisiana Board of Examiners for Certified Shorthand Reporters and the Louisiana State Polygraph Board, among others. The bill inherently seeks to reduce bureaucratic constraints on these professions, suggesting a shift towards deregulation.

Sentiment

General sentiment surrounding HB 959 appears to be mixed. Proponents view the bill as a necessary reform to eliminate outdated regulatory frameworks that limit workforce participation and innovation. In contrast, critics express apprehension that such deregulation might endanger public interests by allowing unqualified individuals to practice in essential fields. The debate reflects a broader ideological conflict over the role of government in regulating professions and protecting consumers.

Contention

A key point of contention is the exemption clause within the bill, which protects specific professions from the wave of deregulation, particularly those in healthcare and law. While the bill aims to simplify licensing for many, it completely excludes health professionals and attorneys, suggesting an acknowledgment of the critical nature of these fields. This selective approach may create disparities in how different professions are regulated, prompting questions about fairness and consistency in the application of regulatory standards.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR15

Commends the Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors and recognizes March 18, 2014, as "Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day" at the State Capitol.

LA SR50

Recognizes April 27, 2017, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR100

Recognizes May 5, 2016, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA HB445

Provides relative to the Louisiana Licensed Professional Vocational Rehabilitation Counselors Board of Examiners

LA SCR100

Requests the Louisiana State Board of Examiners of Psychologists and the Louisiana Licensed Professional Counselors Board of Examiners to work in collaboration through the Mental Health Professional Working Group to meet certain goals and to report to the Senate and House committees on health and welfare by February 1, 2011.

LA SB226

Consolidates the State Board of Examiners of Psychologists and the Louisiana Licensed Professional Counselors Board of Examiners into the Louisiana Behavioral Sciences Regulatory Board. (See Act)

LA HR205

Urges and requests the Louisiana Department of Health and the Louisiana Workforce Commission to organize a special committee to develop strategies for addressing the direct support professional workforce shortage

LA SR26

Recognizes Tuesday, May 3, 2011, as Louisiana Society of Professional Surveyors Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.