Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Effective date 8/1/2024.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 532.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 12. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|