House | 04/17/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |