Louisiana 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR57

Introduced
4/22/19  
Passed
4/23/19  

Caption

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2019, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.

Impact

By declaring April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month, the resolution serves to bring attention to this often-overlooked condition, encouraging discussions around its causes, effects, and the importance of research in understanding this disease. The resolution underlines the mission of the Sarcoidosis Awareness Foundation of Louisiana, which aims to promote research, education, and support for individuals and families affected by sarcoidosis. This kind of legislative recognition can help empower patients and raise necessary funds for further research.

Summary

Senate Resolution 57 recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2019, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol. The resolution highlights sarcoidosis as an inflammatory disease that can affect various organs in the body, emphasizing the importance of increasing public awareness regarding the condition and its impact on those affected. The resolution urges citizens of Louisiana to learn more about this disease throughout the month of April, thus promoting educational initiatives and understanding of sarcoidosis.

Sentiment

The sentiment around SR57 is largely positive, aimed at fostering awareness and support for those living with sarcoidosis. Legislative support for health awareness initiatives is generally well-received as it aligns with community health goals. Key stakeholders, including health advocates and support groups, likely view the resolution as an essential step towards improving the quality of life for those affected by the disease through increased public engagement and education.

Contention

While the resolution appears straightforward, discussions surrounding health awareness initiatives can sometimes raise questions about resource allocation and the prioritization of various health conditions in legislative discussions. However, in this case, the unifying goal of increasing awareness about sarcoidosis seems to resonate widely, leading to a lack of notable contention in the discourse surrounding SR57.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR94

Recognizes April 2012 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge.

LA SR123

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2021, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR36

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 19, 2017, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.

LA SR59

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 2, 2018, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.

LA HCR26

Recognizes April of 2011 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in La. and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge

LA HCR99

Recognizes April of 2012 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in La. and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge

LA HR40

Recognizes the month of April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month

LA HR99

Recognizes April 21, 2013, as Rhonda R. McCullough Day in Louisiana