Louisiana 2018 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR59

Introduced
4/2/18  
Introduced
4/2/18  

Caption

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 2, 2018, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR94

Recognizes April 2012 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge.

LA SR123

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2021, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR57

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2019, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.

LA SR36

Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 19, 2017, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.

LA HCR99

Recognizes April of 2012 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in La. and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge

LA HCR26

Recognizes April of 2011 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in La. and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge

LA HR40

Recognizes the month of April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month

LA HR99

Recognizes April 21, 2013, as Rhonda R. McCullough Day in Louisiana