Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2021, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 13, 2019, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.
Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 19, 2017, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.
Recognizes April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in Louisiana and designates April 2, 2018, as Sarcoidosis Awareness Day at the state capitol.
Recognizes April of 2011 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in La. and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge
Recognizes April of 2012 as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month in La. and commends the Sarcoidosis Awareness Support Group of Greater Baton Rouge
Recognizes the month of April as Sarcoidosis Awareness Month
Recognizes April 21, 2013, as Rhonda R. McCullough Day in Louisiana