Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HF572

Introduced
3/2/23  
Engrossed
4/11/23  
Introduced
3/2/23  
Refer
6/5/23  
Engrossed
4/11/23  
Enrolled
4/23/24  
Refer
6/5/23  
Passed
5/3/24  
Enrolled
4/23/24  

Caption

A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties. (Formerly HF 388.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.

Impact

The bill has significant implications for state laws concerning privacy and property rights. By introducing misdemeanor offenses linked to drone surveillance and intrusion, HF572 consolidates protections for individuals and property owners from unwanted aerial encroachments. This could lead to further discussions and potential legislation regarding the broader use of drones and their impact on civil liberties and local governance.

Summary

House File 572, also known as the bill prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft over certain properties, aims to protect privacy and property rights by imposing regulations on drone usage. This legislation defines specific offenses related to intrusion and surveillance by remotely piloted aircraft, providing penalties for violators. As per the bill, individuals controlling drones above private properties without authorization can face misdemeanors, and repeated violations could lead to more severe penalties. It also enables property owners to seek injunctive relief in court against harassment from unauthorized drone activity. The bill is set to take effect on July 1, 2024.

Sentiment

Discussion around HF572 appears to be generally supportive, particularly from constituencies concerned about privacy and the safety of property. However, some dissent may arise from those in favor of less regulation on drone usage, arguing that the bill could impinge upon technological advancement and the use of drones for legitimate purposes such as agriculture or emergency services. The overall sentiment indicates a proactive approach to balancing technological progress with individual rights.

Contention

Key points of contention stemming from HF572 relate to its enforcement and potential overreach. Critics may argue that the bill could hinder beneficial drone applications, such as agricultural monitoring and disaster response, by imposing strict regulations and penalties. Additionally, the clarity surrounding the definitions of secure farmsteads and homesteads, as well as the delineation of authorized users, can lead to further legal disputes and interpretations, potentially complicating drone usage across various sectors.

Companion Bills

IA HF388

Similar To A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(See HF 572.)

IA SF369

Similar To A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(See SF 520.)

IA SF520

Similar To A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 369.)

Similar Bills

IA SF520

A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 369.)

IA SF369

A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(See SF 520.)

IA HF388

A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(See HF 572.)

ND HB1429

Harassment and stalking with a robot; and to provide a penalty.

IA SSB1191

A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over farm property, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 491.)

IA SF491

A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over farm property, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1191.) Effective date: 07/01/2025

OK SB1072

Unmanned aircraft systems; prohibiting use over certain property. Effective date.

IA SF2443

A bill for an act relating to state government and finances, including by making, modifying, limiting, or reducing appropriations, distributions, or transfers, authorizing expenditure of unappropriated moneys in special funds, providing for properly related matters including the state government efficiency review committee and teacher salary supplement district cost per pupil calculations, making corrections, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3208.) Effective date: Enactment, 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024, 01/01/2025. Conditional applicability date.