House | 08/26/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H4903 | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday June 10, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 11/20/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |