Senate | 07/11/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 06/14/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 06/06/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |