Senate | 02/12/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4160 | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4160 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4160 | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Read third | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/25/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 08/14/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 08/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |