04/17/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | House concurred in the Senate amendment | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/05/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 06/14/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |