LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H3577
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H3577
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H3577
Action History
House
05/30/2024
Accompanied a new draft, see H4689
Senate
04/11/2024
Senate concurred
House
02/12/2024
Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence
Joint
09/14/2023
Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
House
03/30/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws