House | 09/05/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see H5014 | ||
House | 06/24/2024 | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Reporting date extended to Monday June 17, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 15, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 09/24/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |