House | 05/09/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 08/30/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Joint | 07/07/2023 | Hearing rescheduled to 10/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 06/06/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |