LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H3715
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H3715
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H3715
Action History
House
06/29/2023
Accompanied a new draft, see H3952
Joint
04/10/2023
Hearing scheduled for 04/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Senate
04/06/2023
Senate concurred
House
04/03/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure