House | 09/14/2023 | Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4093 | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Read third | ||
House | 07/31/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 07/31/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/31/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 07/17/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 06/12/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |