Senate | 07/27/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 06/29/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 06/26/2023 | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 06/15/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 04/21/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |