06/27/2023 | Signed by the Lieutenant Governor, Chapter 16 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 06/22/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | New draft of H250 | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |