10/12/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 10/05/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 08/31/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 08/17/2023 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 08/14/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 07/31/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/31/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 07/26/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 07/07/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 07/06/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 07/03/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |