House | 05/15/2024 | Amended by substitution of bill with the same title, see H4645 | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Read third | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 12/28/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 10/09/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 | ||
Senate | 08/10/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 08/07/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |