10/06/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 10/02/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | Emergency preamble adopted | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 09/25/2023 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 09/11/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 09/07/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary | ||
House | 08/28/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |