House | 12/23/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 12/23/2024 | Emergency preamble adopted | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 12/19/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 05/09/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 01/10/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 10/02/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 08/03/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |