House | 05/30/2024 | New draft substituted, see H4700 | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | ||
House | 05/30/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4700 | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 10/13/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |