02/21/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 12/26/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 12/26/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 12/26/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 11/27/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 11/08/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 10/30/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |