12/14/2023 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2023 | |||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 12/11/2023 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Emergency preamble adopted | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Committee recommended ought to pass | ||
Senate | 11/29/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | New draft of H3888 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Pending new draft of H3888 | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |