House | 05/22/2024 | New draft substituted, see H4661 | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4661 | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means | ||
House | 05/06/2024 | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 01/11/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 | ||
House | 11/13/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |