05/30/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 105 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 01/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |