07/09/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 127 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 07/03/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 07/02/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 07/01/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 02/08/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 02/07/2024 from 04:00 PM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |