07/02/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 05/28/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 02/23/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |