Senate | 06/13/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 06/10/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service | ||
House | 12/14/2023 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |