House | 08/22/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4895 | ||
House | 08/22/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 08/22/2024 | Amendment (changing reporting date to Tuesday August 27, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 08/22/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday August 27, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
House | 07/01/2024 | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday July 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Amendment adopted | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 25, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 04/12/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 04/17/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |