12/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 12/02/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 11/27/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 11/27/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 11/27/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Substituted for H4019 |