LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H4637
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H4637
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H4637
Action History
House
08/22/2024
Accompanied a study order, see H4996
Joint
05/31/2024
Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Senate
05/16/2024
Senate concurred
House
05/13/2024
Referred to the Joint Committee on Education