08/07/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Laid before the Governor | ||
Senate | 07/31/2024 | Enacted -see Roll Call #231 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Enacted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 167 ) | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 07/30/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Substituted for H4046 |