12/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 255 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 12/02/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 11/27/2024 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 11/27/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 08/15/2024 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
House | 08/12/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/25/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 07/01/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 06/18/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/10/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |