House | 08/12/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4990 | ||
House | 07/29/2024 | Recommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | ||
House | 07/29/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/29/2024 | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) | ||
Joint | 07/03/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |