Senate | 08/05/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 07/31/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 07/30/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 07/24/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2024 from 01:30 PM-01:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
Senate | 07/15/2024 | Senate concurred | ||
House | 07/11/2024 | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Referred to the committee on House Rules |