LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H736
Action History
MA
Massachusetts House Bill H736
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts House Bill H736
Action History
House
07/11/2024
Accompanied a study order, see H4765
Senate
03/14/2024
Senate concurred
House
02/12/2024
Reporting date extended to Friday March 15, 2024, pending concurrence
Joint
06/05/2023
Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
House
02/16/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on Emergency Preparedness and Management