Senate | 04/08/2024 | New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2715 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Read third | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/27/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 07/03/2023 | Accompanied by H2074 | ||
Joint | 04/04/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |