Senate | 04/22/2024 | Accompanied a study order, see S2733 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Accompanied by H2264 | ||
Joint | 09/08/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Joint | 07/21/2023 | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD | ||
Joint | 07/17/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |