Senate | 03/28/2024 | New draft substituted, see S2712 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Read second | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Order relative to subject matter adopted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2712 | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 09/26/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |