LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Massachusetts MA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S212
Action History
MA
Massachusetts Senate Bill S212
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Massachusetts 2023-2024 Regular Session
Massachusetts Senate Bill S212
Action History
Senate
04/22/2024
Accompanied a study order, see S2733
Senate
03/21/2024
Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Joint
05/26/2023
Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
House
04/13/2023
House concurred
Senate
04/06/2023
Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
Senate
02/16/2023
Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure