Senate | 01/11/2024 | New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2553 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Read third | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 12/14/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 11/06/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Joint | 07/17/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 06/20/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |