03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 47 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Enacted | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 09/25/2023 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | New draft of S1653 | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | Reported from the committee on Public Service |