Senate | 02/26/2024 | New draft substituted, see S2691 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Read second | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2691 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 11/22/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means | ||
Joint | 10/23/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service | ||
Senate | 09/18/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |