House | 07/10/2024 | Accompanied a new draft, see H4832 | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence | ||
Joint | 11/15/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary | ||
Senate | 09/28/2023 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |