Senate | 02/05/2024 | New draft (Finegold) substituted, see S2582 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Read third | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 12/26/2023 | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | ||
Joint | 11/07/2023 | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 | ||
House | 10/30/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |