02/29/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Emergency preamble adopted | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee | ||
House | 12/21/2023 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 11/13/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |