04/17/2024 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2024 | |||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Enacted | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling | ||
Joint | 03/11/2024 | Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2024 from 04:00 PM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | House concurred | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |